THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 03:44:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8 Richmond Park Dr, Greater Napanee
Napanee Ontario K7R 2Z4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 354-3301
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 75 Charles St.,
Brockville Ontario K6V 1S8
Phone: 613-345-5649
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 31 Jul 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Webb Gambarotta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Gambarotta (CPSO#: 84219 ) Dr. K. Webb (CPSO#: 84399 )
Business Address: Queen's Family Medicine
220 Bagot Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5E9
(613) 533-9300
Business Address: Lennox & Addington County General Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee Ontario K7R 2Z4
(613) 354-3301
Business Address: 75 Charles St
Brockville ON K6V 1S8
(613) 345-5649

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8 Richmond Park Dr, Greater Napanee
Napanee Ontario K7R 2Z4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 354-3301
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 75 Charles St.,
Brockville Ontario K6V 1S8
Phone: 613-345-5649
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 31 Jul 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Webb Gambarotta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Gambarotta (CPSO#: 84219 ) Dr. K. Webb (CPSO#: 84399 )
Business Address: Queen's Family Medicine
220 Bagot Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5E9
(613) 533-9300
Business Address: Lennox & Addington County General Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee Ontario K7R 2Z4
(613) 354-3301
Business Address: 75 Charles St
Brockville ON K6V 1S8
(613) 345-5649

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLA GAMBAROTTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAMBAROTTA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLA GAMBAROTTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAMBAROTTA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006