THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 08:33:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 220 Bagot St
Queen's Family Medicine Centre
Family Medicine
220 Bagot St
Kingston ON K7L 3G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 533-9303
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jan 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 08 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Webb Gambarotta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Gambarotta (CPSO#: 84219 ) Dr. K. Webb (CPSO#: 84399 )
Business Address: Queen's Family Medicine
220 Bagot Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5E9
(613) 533-9300
Business Address: Lennox & Addington County General Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee Ontario K7R 2Z4
(613) 354-3301
Business Address: 75 Charles St
Brockville ON K6V 1S8
(613) 345-5649

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 220 Bagot St
Queen's Family Medicine Centre
Family Medicine
220 Bagot St
Kingston ON K7L 3G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 533-9303
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jan 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 08 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Webb Gambarotta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Gambarotta (CPSO#: 84219 ) Dr. K. Webb (CPSO#: 84399 )
Business Address: Queen's Family Medicine
220 Bagot Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5E9
(613) 533-9300
Business Address: Lennox & Addington County General Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee Ontario K7R 2Z4
(613) 354-3301
Business Address: 75 Charles St
Brockville ON K6V 1S8
(613) 345-5649

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATIE ANNE DOROTHY WEBB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEBB is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATIE ANNE DOROTHY WEBB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEBB is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jan 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006