THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:49:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6175 Highway 7
Unit 20 iHealth Center
Vaughan Ontario L4H 0P6
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 905-497-2255
Fax: 905-497-2261
Address: William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: 416-747-3400
Extension: 34567
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 11 Oct 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 11 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Sukhai & V. Kapila Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sukhai (CPSO#: 84608 ) Dr. V. Kapila (CPSO#: 84385 )
Business Address: Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Blvd
Toronto Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 747-3400
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6175 Highway 7
Unit 20 iHealth Center
Vaughan Ontario L4H 0P6
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 905-497-2255
Fax: 905-497-2261
Address: William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: 416-747-3400
Extension: 34567
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 11 Oct 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 11 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Sukhai & V. Kapila Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sukhai (CPSO#: 84608 ) Dr. V. Kapila (CPSO#: 84385 )
Business Address: Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Blvd
Toronto Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 747-3400
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VARUN KAPILA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAPILA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VARUN KAPILA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAPILA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006