THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:28:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 494-2120
Fax: (416) 747-3611

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Sukhai & V. Kapila Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sukhai (CPSO#: 84608 ) Dr. V. Kapila (CPSO#: 84385 )
Business Address: Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Blvd
Toronto Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 747-3400
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 494-2120
Fax: (416) 747-3611

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Sukhai & V. Kapila Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sukhai (CPSO#: 84608 ) Dr. V. Kapila (CPSO#: 84385 )
Business Address: Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Blvd
Toronto Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 747-3400
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATASHA PREYA SUKHAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUKHAI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATASHA PREYA SUKHAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUKHAI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Apr 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006