THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:16:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 25 Cumberland Street
Cornwall Ontario K6J 4G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 938-2552
Fax: (613) 938-2559

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital Alexandria
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
HOSPITAL: Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alexandria

HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dang-Lemire Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lemire (CPSO#: 84485 ) Dr. Y. Dang (CPSO#: 84413 )
Business Address: 840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 5S5
(613) 938-4240
Business Address: 25 Cumberland Street
Cornwall Ontario K6J 4G8
(613) 938-2552 Extn: 2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 25 Cumberland Street
Cornwall Ontario K6J 4G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 938-2552
Fax: (613) 938-2559

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital Alexandria
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
HOSPITAL: Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alexandria

HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dang-Lemire Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lemire (CPSO#: 84485 ) Dr. Y. Dang (CPSO#: 84413 )
Business Address: 840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 5S5
(613) 938-4240
Business Address: 25 Cumberland Street
Cornwall Ontario K6J 4G8
(613) 938-2552 Extn: 2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YEN KINH DANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YEN KINH DANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 May 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006