THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:43:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 5S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 938-4240
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.L. Celine Lemire Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lemire (CPSO#: 84485 )
Business Address: 22 Forest Hill Rd
South Stormont Ontario K0C 1P0
613-662-3135
Business Address: 840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 5S5
613-662-3135

Corporation Name: Dang-Lemire Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lemire (CPSO#: 84485 ) Dr. Y. Dang (CPSO#: 84413 )
Business Address: 840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 5S5
(613) 938-4240
Business Address: 25 Cumberland Street
Cornwall Ontario K6J 4G8
(613) 938-2552 Extn: 2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 5S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 938-4240
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.L. Celine Lemire Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lemire (CPSO#: 84485 )
Business Address: 22 Forest Hill Rd
South Stormont Ontario K0C 1P0
613-662-3135
Business Address: 840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 5S5
613-662-3135

Corporation Name: Dang-Lemire Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lemire (CPSO#: 84485 ) Dr. Y. Dang (CPSO#: 84413 )
Business Address: 840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 5S5
(613) 938-4240
Business Address: 25 Cumberland Street
Cornwall Ontario K6J 4G8
(613) 938-2552 Extn: 2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIE LOUISE CELINE LEMIRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEMIRE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIE LOUISE CELINE LEMIRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEMIRE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006