THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:05:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Paediatrics
Division of Adolescent Medicine
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-7500
Fax: (416) 813-5392

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Adolescent Medicine
Effective: 24 Sep 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Adolescent Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pugh Toulany Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Toulany (CPSO#: 84479 ) Dr. J. Pugh (CPSO#: 91733 )
Business Address: 555 University Ave
The Hospital for Sick Children, Department of Pediatrics, Division of Adolescent Medicine
4168137500
Business Address: McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100

Corporation Name: Pugh Toulany Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Paediatrics
Division of Adolescent Medicine
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-7500
Fax: (416) 813-5392

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Adolescent Medicine
Effective: 24 Sep 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Adolescent Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pugh Toulany Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Toulany (CPSO#: 84479 ) Dr. J. Pugh (CPSO#: 91733 )
Business Address: 555 University Ave
The Hospital for Sick Children, Department of Pediatrics, Division of Adolescent Medicine
4168137500
Business Address: McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100

Corporation Name: Pugh Toulany Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALENE AHLAM TOULANY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOULANY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALENE AHLAM TOULANY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOULANY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006