THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 08:09:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of London, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Effective: 24 Sep 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 31 May 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pugh Toulany Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Toulany (CPSO#: 84479 ) Dr. J. Pugh (CPSO#: 91733 )
Business Address: 555 University Ave
The Hospital for Sick Children, Department of Pediatrics, Division of Adolescent Medicine
4168137500
Business Address: McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100

Corporation Name: Pugh Toulany Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of London, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Effective: 24 Sep 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 31 May 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pugh Toulany Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Toulany (CPSO#: 84479 ) Dr. J. Pugh (CPSO#: 91733 )
Business Address: 555 University Ave
The Hospital for Sick Children, Department of Pediatrics, Division of Adolescent Medicine
4168137500
Business Address: McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100

Corporation Name: Pugh Toulany Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES EDWARD VERNON PUGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUGH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES EDWARD VERNON PUGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUGH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of London, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009