THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:42:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: Kempinska, Anna (Used Until: 18 May 2023)
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Center
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 990 Gainsborough Road
London Ontario N6H 5L4
Phone: 5196018621
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1295 Riverbend Road
London Ontario N6K 0G2
Phone: 4165735583
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 31 Dec 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.W. Komorowsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kempinska Komorowsky (CPSO#: 84535 ) Dr. A. Komorowsky (CPSO#: 96150 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Address: 189 Elm Street
STEGH
Emergency Department
St. Thomas Ontario N5R 1J3
Business Address: Michael Garron Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 461-8272
Business Address: 30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8

General Information

Former Name: Kempinska, Anna (Used Until: 18 May 2023)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Center
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 990 Gainsborough Road
London Ontario N6H 5L4
Phone: 5196018621
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1295 Riverbend Road
London Ontario N6K 0G2
Phone: 4165735583
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 31 Dec 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.W. Komorowsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kempinska Komorowsky (CPSO#: 84535 ) Dr. A. Komorowsky (CPSO#: 96150 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Address: 189 Elm Street
STEGH
Emergency Department
St. Thomas Ontario N5R 1J3
Business Address: Michael Garron Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 461-8272
Business Address: 30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNA KEMPINSKA KOMOROWSKY KOMOROWSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEMPINSKA KOMOROWSKY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNA KEMPINSKA KOMOROWSKY KOMOROWSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEMPINSKA KOMOROWSKY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Oct 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006