THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 10:07:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 189 Elm Street
STEGH
Emergency Department
St. Thomas Ontario N5R 1J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196312030
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Michael Garron Hospital
Emergency Department
825 Coxwell Ave
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Phone: 416 461 6435
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.W. Komorowsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kempinska Komorowsky (CPSO#: 84535 ) Dr. A. Komorowsky (CPSO#: 96150 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Address: 189 Elm Street
STEGH
Emergency Department
St. Thomas Ontario N5R 1J3
Business Address: Michael Garron Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 461-8272
Business Address: 30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 189 Elm Street
STEGH
Emergency Department
St. Thomas Ontario N5R 1J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196312030
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Michael Garron Hospital
Emergency Department
825 Coxwell Ave
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Phone: 416 461 6435
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.W. Komorowsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kempinska Komorowsky (CPSO#: 84535 ) Dr. A. Komorowsky (CPSO#: 96150 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Address: 189 Elm Street
STEGH
Emergency Department
St. Thomas Ontario N5R 1J3
Business Address: Michael Garron Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 461-8272
Business Address: 30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREI WOLODYMYR KOMOROWSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOMOROWSKY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREI WOLODYMYR KOMOROWSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOMOROWSKY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011