THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 07:40:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Charlton Avenue East
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1Y3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 522 1155
Fax: (905) 387-6093
Address: 1960 Appleby Line
North Burlington Medical Centre
18-1960 Appleby Line
Burlington Ontario L7L 0B7
Phone: 9053192000
Fax: 9053196292
Address: 505 King Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8P 1B9
Phone: 905 525 3501
Fax: 905 528 5468

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yang Douglass Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Douglass (CPSO#: 84651 ) Dr. I. Yang (CPSO#: 84728 )
Business Address: 505 King Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8P 1B9
(905) 525-3501
Business Address: Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Suite B3
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 43850

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Charlton Avenue East
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1Y3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 522 1155
Fax: (905) 387-6093
Address: 1960 Appleby Line
North Burlington Medical Centre
18-1960 Appleby Line
Burlington Ontario L7L 0B7
Phone: 9053192000
Fax: 9053196292
Address: 505 King Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8P 1B9
Phone: 905 525 3501
Fax: 905 528 5468

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yang Douglass Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Douglass (CPSO#: 84651 ) Dr. I. Yang (CPSO#: 84728 )
Business Address: 505 King Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8P 1B9
(905) 525-3501
Business Address: Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Suite B3
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 43850

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REBECCA JANET DOUGLASS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOUGLASS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REBECCA JANET DOUGLASS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOUGLASS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006