THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:20:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Juravinski Hospital
Section B3
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 43850
Fax: (905) 528-9388

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Colorectal Surgery
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Colorectal Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yang Douglass Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Douglass (CPSO#: 84651 ) Dr. I. Yang (CPSO#: 84728 )
Business Address: 505 King Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8P 1B9
(905) 525-3501
Business Address: Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Suite B3
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 43850

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Juravinski Hospital
Section B3
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 43850
Fax: (905) 528-9388

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Colorectal Surgery
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Colorectal Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yang Douglass Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Douglass (CPSO#: 84651 ) Dr. I. Yang (CPSO#: 84728 )
Business Address: 505 King Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8P 1B9
(905) 525-3501
Business Address: Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Suite B3
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 43850

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ILUN YANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ILUN YANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006