THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/04/25 20:00:18 PM

General Information

Former Name: Morinis, Julia Beth Spring (Used Until: 17 Dec 2013)
Medical School: McMaster University, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hospital For Sick Children
Department of Paediatrics
8th Floor 8223
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-7654
Extension: 201150
Fax: (416) 813-5663

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 07 Oct 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 07 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Orkin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Orkin (CPSO#: 86358 ) Dr. J. Orkin (CPSO#: 86355 )
Business Address: 30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5

General Information

Former Name: Morinis, Julia Beth Spring (Used Until: 17 Dec 2013)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hospital For Sick Children
Department of Paediatrics
8th Floor 8223
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-7654
Extension: 201150
Fax: (416) 813-5663

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 07 Oct 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 07 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Orkin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Orkin (CPSO#: 86358 ) Dr. J. Orkin (CPSO#: 86355 )
Business Address: 30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIA BETH SPRING ORKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ORKIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIA BETH SPRING ORKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ORKIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Oct 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007