THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 17:10:08 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Health Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 530-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Phone: 416 242 1000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Dalla Lana School of Public Health
155 College St
Toronto Ontario M5T 3M7
Phone: (416) 978-2058
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 14 Oct 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 14 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Public Health and Preventive Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Orkin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Orkin (CPSO#: 86358 ) Dr. J. Orkin (CPSO#: 86355 )
Business Address: 30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Health Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 530-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Phone: 416 242 1000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Dalla Lana School of Public Health
155 College St
Toronto Ontario M5T 3M7
Phone: (416) 978-2058
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 14 Oct 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 14 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Public Health and Preventive Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Orkin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Orkin (CPSO#: 86358 ) Dr. J. Orkin (CPSO#: 86355 )
Business Address: 30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AARON MICHAEL ORKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ORKIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AARON MICHAEL ORKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ORKIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007