THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/04/25 02:41:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 College Dr
North Bay ON P1B 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-474-8600
Fax: No Information Available
Address: North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 0A4
Phone: 705-474-8600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dominic Krzeczunowicz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Krzeczunowicz (CPSO#: 86762 ) Dr. E. Kirby (CPSO#: 86412 )
Business Address: North Bay Regional Health Centre
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
(705) 474-8600

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 College Dr
North Bay ON P1B 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-474-8600
Fax: No Information Available
Address: North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 0A4
Phone: 705-474-8600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dominic Krzeczunowicz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Krzeczunowicz (CPSO#: 86762 ) Dr. E. Kirby (CPSO#: 86412 )
Business Address: North Bay Regional Health Centre
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
(705) 474-8600

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMILY KATHRYN KIRBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRBY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMILY KATHRYN KIRBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRBY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007