THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 22:23:03 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North Bay Regional Health Centre
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 474-8600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: West Nipissing General Hospital
LOCATION: Sturgeon Falls

HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dominic Krzeczunowicz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Krzeczunowicz (CPSO#: 86762 ) Dr. E. Kirby (CPSO#: 86412 )
Business Address: North Bay Regional Health Centre
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
(705) 474-8600

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North Bay Regional Health Centre
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 474-8600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: West Nipissing General Hospital
LOCATION: Sturgeon Falls

HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dominic Krzeczunowicz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Krzeczunowicz (CPSO#: 86762 ) Dr. E. Kirby (CPSO#: 86412 )
Business Address: North Bay Regional Health Centre
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
(705) 474-8600

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOMINIC EDWARD JOHN KRZECZUNOWICZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRZECZUNOWICZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOMINIC EDWARD JOHN KRZECZUNOWICZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRZECZUNOWICZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007