THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:43:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of New South Wales Faculty of Medicine, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MALAY, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6707, #132 Elbow drive SW
Calgary Alberta T2V 0E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 18666112665
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - New Brunswick
Canada - Nunavut
Canada - Saskatchewan
Canada - Yukon Territory
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aun-Yeong Chong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chong (CPSO#: 89458 ) Dr. S. Lim (CPSO#: 88120 )
Business Address: University of Ottawa
Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
(613) 696-7280

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MALAY, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of New South Wales Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6707, #132 Elbow drive SW
Calgary Alberta T2V 0E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 18666112665
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - New Brunswick
Canada - Nunavut
Canada - Saskatchewan
Canada - Yukon Territory
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aun-Yeong Chong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chong (CPSO#: 89458 ) Dr. S. Lim (CPSO#: 88120 )
Business Address: University of Ottawa
Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
(613) 696-7280

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIOK PING LIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIOK PING LIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of New South Wales Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Oct 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Feb 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 May 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Feb 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Apr 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Mar 2008