THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 16:55:08 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of New South Wales Faculty of Medicine, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University of Ottawa
Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 696 7280
Fax: (613) 696 7245
Address: 40 Ruskin St
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7
Phone: 6136967000
Extension: 67280
Fax: 6136967245

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 29 May 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University of Ottawa Heart Institute Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: University of Ottawa Heart Institute
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aun-Yeong Chong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chong (CPSO#: 89458 ) Dr. S. Lim (CPSO#: 88120 )
Business Address: University of Ottawa
Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
(613) 696-7280

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of New South Wales Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University of Ottawa
Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 696 7280
Fax: (613) 696 7245
Address: 40 Ruskin St
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7
Phone: 6136967000
Extension: 67280
Fax: 6136967245

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 29 May 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University of Ottawa Heart Institute Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: University of Ottawa Heart Institute
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aun-Yeong Chong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chong (CPSO#: 89458 ) Dr. S. Lim (CPSO#: 88120 )
Business Address: University of Ottawa
Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
(613) 696-7280

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
11 Mar 2021
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 11 2021
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. AUN YEONG CHONG may practise medicine independently in cardiology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. AUN YEONG CHONG may practise medicine independently in cardiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of New South Wales Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Mar 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 17 Apr 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Dec 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 19 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Mar 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 17 Apr 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 May 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 May 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008