THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 07:35:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Maitland Valley Medical Centre
180 Cambria Rd. N
Goderich Ontario N7A4N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5195246060
Fax: 5195245225

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Reddington & Renaud Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Renaud (CPSO#: 88371 ) Dr. M. Reddington (CPSO#: 90533 )
Business Address: Maitland Valley Medical Centre
180 Cambria Road North
Goderich Ontario N7A 4N8
(519) 524-6060
Business Address: 274 Huron Road
Goderich Ontario N7A 3A2
(519) 524-8316
Business Address: Alexandria Marine & General Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
120 Napier Street
Goderich Ontario N7A 1W5
(519) 524-8689

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Maitland Valley Medical Centre
180 Cambria Rd. N
Goderich Ontario N7A4N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5195246060
Fax: 5195245225

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Reddington & Renaud Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Renaud (CPSO#: 88371 ) Dr. M. Reddington (CPSO#: 90533 )
Business Address: Maitland Valley Medical Centre
180 Cambria Road North
Goderich Ontario N7A 4N8
(519) 524-6060
Business Address: 274 Huron Road
Goderich Ontario N7A 3A2
(519) 524-8316
Business Address: Alexandria Marine & General Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
120 Napier Street
Goderich Ontario N7A 1W5
(519) 524-8689

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MONIQUE MARGUERITE RENAUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RENAUD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MONIQUE MARGUERITE RENAUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RENAUD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008