THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:12:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Alexandra Marine & General Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
120 Napier Street
Goderich Ontario N7A 1W5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 524-8689
Extension: 5388
Fax: 519 524 8513

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 04 Oct 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 04 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Reddington & Renaud Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Renaud (CPSO#: 88371 ) Dr. M. Reddington (CPSO#: 90533 )
Business Address: Maitland Valley Medical Centre
180 Cambria Road North
Goderich Ontario N7A 4N8
(519) 524-6060
Business Address: 274 Huron Road
Goderich Ontario N7A 3A2
(519) 524-8316
Business Address: Alexandria Marine & General Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
120 Napier Street
Goderich Ontario N7A 1W5
(519) 524-8689

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Alexandra Marine & General Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
120 Napier Street
Goderich Ontario N7A 1W5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 524-8689
Extension: 5388
Fax: 519 524 8513

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 04 Oct 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 04 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Reddington & Renaud Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Renaud (CPSO#: 88371 ) Dr. M. Reddington (CPSO#: 90533 )
Business Address: Maitland Valley Medical Centre
180 Cambria Road North
Goderich Ontario N7A 4N8
(519) 524-6060
Business Address: 274 Huron Road
Goderich Ontario N7A 3A2
(519) 524-8316
Business Address: Alexandria Marine & General Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
120 Napier Street
Goderich Ontario N7A 1W5
(519) 524-8689

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK REDDINGTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REDDINGTON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK REDDINGTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REDDINGTON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Oct 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Oct 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Oct 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009