THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 19:21:19 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-100 Frank Miller Dr
Huntsville ON P1H 1H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-789-2311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Huntsville District Mem. Hospital
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H7
Phone: (705) 789-0022
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 14 Mill Street
Fairvern Nursing Home
Huntsville Ontario P1H 2A4
Phone: 705-789-4476
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 Frank Miller Drive
Howland Building -Algonquin FHT
Palliative Care Team
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H7
Phone: 705-787-0846
Fax: 705-787-1948

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Dec 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 14 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel Purcell & Rebecca Kent Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Apr 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Purcell (CPSO#: 89422 ) Dr. R. Kent (CPSO#: 88818 )
Business Address: 39 Campus Trail
Unit 2
Huntsville Ontario P1H0E5
705-788-3623
Business Address: 348 Muskoka Road 3 north
Suite 202
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H8
(705) 788-3623

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-100 Frank Miller Dr
Huntsville ON P1H 1H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-789-2311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Huntsville District Mem. Hospital
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H7
Phone: (705) 789-0022
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 14 Mill Street
Fairvern Nursing Home
Huntsville Ontario P1H 2A4
Phone: 705-789-4476
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 Frank Miller Drive
Howland Building -Algonquin FHT
Palliative Care Team
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H7
Phone: 705-787-0846
Fax: 705-787-1948

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Dec 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 14 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel Purcell & Rebecca Kent Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Apr 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Purcell (CPSO#: 89422 ) Dr. R. Kent (CPSO#: 88818 )
Business Address: 39 Campus Trail
Unit 2
Huntsville Ontario P1H0E5
705-788-3623
Business Address: 348 Muskoka Road 3 north
Suite 202
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H8
(705) 788-3623

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REBECCA MIDORI KENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REBECCA MIDORI KENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 25 Sep 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008