THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:06:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster Children's Hospital
Pediatric Emergency Medicine
1200 Main St. West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 75020
Fax: 9055212608

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yohanna and Koelink Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Yohanna (CPSO#: 93107 ) Dr. E. Koelink (CPSO#: 89024 )
Business Address: McMaster Children's Hospital
Pediatric Emergency Medicine
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 75020
Business Address: St. Joseph's Health Care
Division of Nephrology
3rd Floor, Marian Wing
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster Children's Hospital
Pediatric Emergency Medicine
1200 Main St. West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 75020
Fax: 9055212608

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yohanna and Koelink Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Yohanna (CPSO#: 93107 ) Dr. E. Koelink (CPSO#: 89024 )
Business Address: McMaster Children's Hospital
Pediatric Emergency Medicine
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 75020
Business Address: St. Joseph's Health Care
Division of Nephrology
3rd Floor, Marian Wing
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIC ANTHONY KOELINK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOELINK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIC ANTHONY KOELINK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOELINK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008