THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 16:30:19 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Healthcare
Division of Nephrology
50 Charlton Avenue East
3rd Floor, Marian Wing
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yohanna and Koelink Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Yohanna (CPSO#: 93107 ) Dr. E. Koelink (CPSO#: 89024 )
Business Address: McMaster Children's Hospital
Pediatric Emergency Medicine
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 75020
Business Address: St. Joseph's Health Care
Division of Nephrology
3rd Floor, Marian Wing
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Healthcare
Division of Nephrology
50 Charlton Avenue East
3rd Floor, Marian Wing
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yohanna and Koelink Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Yohanna (CPSO#: 93107 ) Dr. E. Koelink (CPSO#: 89024 )
Business Address: McMaster Children's Hospital
Pediatric Emergency Medicine
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 75020
Business Address: St. Joseph's Health Care
Division of Nephrology
3rd Floor, Marian Wing
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEYCHELLE YOHANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOHANNA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEYCHELLE YOHANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOHANNA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010