THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:12:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 353 Montreal Rd
Unit 107
Vanier ON K1L 6B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 366-7557
Fax: (613) 212-8893

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Waters Duong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Waters (CPSO#: 92919 ) Dr. A. Duong (CPSO#: 90488 )
Business Address: 107-353 Montréal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1L 6B1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 353 Montreal Rd
Unit 107
Vanier ON K1L 6B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 366-7557
Fax: (613) 212-8893

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Waters Duong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Waters (CPSO#: 92919 ) Dr. A. Duong (CPSO#: 90488 )
Business Address: 107-353 Montréal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1L 6B1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEX KINLAP DUONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEX KINLAP DUONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009