THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:13:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 353 Montreal Rd
Unit 107
Vanier ON K1L 6B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 366-7557
Fax: (613) 212-8893
Address: 501 Smyth road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Phone: 613-798-5555
Extension: 78469
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Waters Duong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Waters (CPSO#: 92919 ) Dr. A. Duong (CPSO#: 90488 )
Business Address: 107-353 Montréal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1L 6B1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 353 Montreal Rd
Unit 107
Vanier ON K1L 6B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 366-7557
Fax: (613) 212-8893
Address: 501 Smyth road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Phone: 613-798-5555
Extension: 78469
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Waters Duong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Waters (CPSO#: 92919 ) Dr. A. Duong (CPSO#: 90488 )
Business Address: 107-353 Montréal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1L 6B1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EUGENIE FRANCES WATERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATERS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EUGENIE FRANCES WATERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATERS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010