THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 17:17:44 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ESTONIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 301-2409 Yonge St
Toronto ON M4P 2E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 785-5001
Fax: (416) 785-6539

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vinay T. Fernandes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Hess (CPSO#: 90500 ) Dr. V. Fernandes (CPSO#: 93061 )
Business Address: 2025 Midland Avenue
Suite 401
Toronto Ontario M1P 3E2
Business Address: 301-2409 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4P 2E7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ESTONIAN
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 301-2409 Yonge St
Toronto ON M4P 2E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 785-5001
Fax: (416) 785-6539

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vinay T. Fernandes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Hess (CPSO#: 90500 ) Dr. V. Fernandes (CPSO#: 93061 )
Business Address: 2025 Midland Avenue
Suite 401
Toronto Ontario M1P 3E2
Business Address: 301-2409 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4P 2E7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LEMBI MALL HESS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HESS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LEMBI MALL HESS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HESS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009