THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:18:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ESTONIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2025 Midland Suite 401
Scarborough Ontario M1P 3E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 746-4545
Fax: (416) 746-1386
Address: 600 University Ave Suite 401
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Phone: 416 586 8533
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vinay T. Fernandes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Hess (CPSO#: 90500 ) Dr. V. Fernandes (CPSO#: 93061 )
Business Address: 2025 Midland Avenue
Suite 401
Toronto Ontario M1P 3E2
Business Address: 301-2409 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4P 2E7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ESTONIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2025 Midland Suite 401
Scarborough Ontario M1P 3E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 746-4545
Fax: (416) 746-1386
Address: 600 University Ave Suite 401
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Phone: 416 586 8533
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vinay T. Fernandes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Hess (CPSO#: 90500 ) Dr. V. Fernandes (CPSO#: 93061 )
Business Address: 2025 Midland Avenue
Suite 401
Toronto Ontario M1P 3E2
Business Address: 301-2409 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4P 2E7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VINAY THOMAS FERNANDES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERNANDES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VINAY THOMAS FERNANDES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERNANDES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010