THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:27:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Maharshi Dayanand University, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2817 Riverside Dr
Ottawa Ontario K1V 8N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 789-1000
Fax: (844) 666-2491

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jul 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 05 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Arora Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Arora (CPSO#: 93002 ) Dr. S. Arora (CPSO#: 90515 )
Business Address: Riverview Medical Centre
2817 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1V 8N4
(613) 789-1000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Maharshi Dayanand University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2817 Riverside Dr
Ottawa Ontario K1V 8N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 789-1000
Fax: (844) 666-2491

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jul 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 05 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Arora Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Arora (CPSO#: 93002 ) Dr. S. Arora (CPSO#: 90515 )
Business Address: Riverview Medical Centre
2817 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1V 8N4
(613) 789-1000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARVSHEEL ARORA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARORA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARVSHEEL ARORA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARORA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Maharshi Dayanand University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 Dec 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Feb 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Dec 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 27 Dec 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009