THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 09:10:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Maharshi Dayanand University, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Riverview Medical Centre
2817, Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1V 8N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 789-1011
Fax: 844-666-2491

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Arora Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Mar 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Arora (CPSO#: 93002 )
Business Address: Riverview Medical Centre
2817 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1V 8N4
(613) 789-1011

Corporation Name: S. Arora Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Arora (CPSO#: 93002 ) Dr. S. Arora (CPSO#: 90515 )
Business Address: Riverview Medical Centre
2817 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1V 8N4
(613) 789-1000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Maharshi Dayanand University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Riverview Medical Centre
2817, Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1V 8N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 789-1011
Fax: 844-666-2491

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Arora Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Mar 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Arora (CPSO#: 93002 )
Business Address: Riverview Medical Centre
2817 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1V 8N4
(613) 789-1011

Corporation Name: S. Arora Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Arora (CPSO#: 93002 ) Dr. S. Arora (CPSO#: 90515 )
Business Address: Riverview Medical Centre
2817 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1V 8N4
(613) 789-1000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MONIL ARORA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARORA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MONIL ARORA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARORA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Maharshi Dayanand University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010