THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:57:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: Randus, Courtney Marie (Used Until: 22 Sep 2010)
Medical School: McMaster University, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1338 Fourth Ave
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 984-3335
Fax: (905) 984-6008

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wickens Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Apr 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Wickens (CPSO#: 90655 ) Dr. C. Wickens (CPSO#: 90632 )
Business Address: 1338 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0G1
(905) 984-3335

General Information

Former Name: Randus, Courtney Marie (Used Until: 22 Sep 2010)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1338 Fourth Ave
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 984-3335
Fax: (905) 984-6008

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wickens Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Apr 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Wickens (CPSO#: 90655 ) Dr. C. Wickens (CPSO#: 90632 )
Business Address: 1338 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0G1
(905) 984-3335

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. COURTNEY MARIE WICKENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WICKENS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. COURTNEY MARIE WICKENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WICKENS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009