THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:21:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 5
4465 Drummond Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 371-0990
Fax: (905) 371-0055

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wickens Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Apr 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Wickens (CPSO#: 90655 ) Dr. C. Wickens (CPSO#: 90632 )
Business Address: 1338 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0G1
(905) 984-3335

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 5
4465 Drummond Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 371-0990
Fax: (905) 371-0055

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wickens Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Apr 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Wickens (CPSO#: 90655 ) Dr. C. Wickens (CPSO#: 90632 )
Business Address: 1338 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0G1
(905) 984-3335

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRANDON RONALD WICKENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WICKENS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRANDON RONALD WICKENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WICKENS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Mar 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009