THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:26:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bay and College Medical Centre
790 Bay Street #108
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 921-2121
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Phone: 416-603-5185
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.Poddar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Poddar (CPSO#: 93361 ) Dr. P. Seth (CPSO#: 90639 )
Business Address: 34 Ellis Park Rd
Toronto ON M6S 2V3
6472217792

Corporation Name: P. Seth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Poddar (CPSO#: 93361 ) Dr. P. Seth (CPSO#: 90639 )
Business Address: 34 Ellis Park Rd
Toronto ON M6S 2V3

Corporation Name: P. Seth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Apr 2023

Corporation Name: M. Poddar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Jan 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bay and College Medical Centre
790 Bay Street #108
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 921-2121
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Phone: 416-603-5185
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.Poddar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Poddar (CPSO#: 93361 ) Dr. P. Seth (CPSO#: 90639 )
Business Address: 34 Ellis Park Rd
Toronto ON M6S 2V3
6472217792

Corporation Name: P. Seth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Poddar (CPSO#: 93361 ) Dr. P. Seth (CPSO#: 90639 )
Business Address: 34 Ellis Park Rd
Toronto ON M6S 2V3

Corporation Name: P. Seth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Apr 2023

Corporation Name: M. Poddar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Jan 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PUNEET SETH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SETH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PUNEET SETH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SETH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009