THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:52:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.Poddar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Poddar (CPSO#: 93361 ) Dr. P. Seth (CPSO#: 90639 )
Business Address: 34 Ellis Park Rd
Toronto ON M6S 2V3
6472217792

Corporation Name: P. Seth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Poddar (CPSO#: 93361 ) Dr. P. Seth (CPSO#: 90639 )
Business Address: 34 Ellis Park Rd
Toronto ON M6S 2V3

Corporation Name: P. Seth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Apr 2023

Corporation Name: M. Poddar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Jan 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.Poddar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Poddar (CPSO#: 93361 ) Dr. P. Seth (CPSO#: 90639 )
Business Address: 34 Ellis Park Rd
Toronto ON M6S 2V3
6472217792

Corporation Name: P. Seth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Poddar (CPSO#: 93361 ) Dr. P. Seth (CPSO#: 90639 )
Business Address: 34 Ellis Park Rd
Toronto ON M6S 2V3

Corporation Name: P. Seth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Apr 2023

Corporation Name: M. Poddar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Jan 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEGHA PODDAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PODDAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEGHA PODDAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PODDAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010