THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 13:13:53 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: RK Schachter Dermatology Centre
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-323-7546
Fax: 416-323-6236
Address: PERC
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Phone: 416-323-7505
Fax: 416-323-6254

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 31 Jul 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drucker and Kozloff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Nov 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Kozloff (CPSO#: 91600 ) Dr. A. Drucker (CPSO#: 90678 )
Business Address: 76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
(416) 323-7546
Business Address: CAMH
1025 Queen Street West
B1-4345
Toronto ON M6J 1H1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: RK Schachter Dermatology Centre
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-323-7546
Fax: 416-323-6236
Address: PERC
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Phone: 416-323-7505
Fax: 416-323-6254

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 31 Jul 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drucker and Kozloff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Nov 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Kozloff (CPSO#: 91600 ) Dr. A. Drucker (CPSO#: 90678 )
Business Address: 76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
(416) 323-7546
Business Address: CAMH
1025 Queen Street West
B1-4345
Toronto ON M6J 1H1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AARON MARK DRUCKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRUCKER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AARON MARK DRUCKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRUCKER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009