THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 05:02:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
1025 Queen Street West, B1-4345
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165358501
Extension: 30769
Fax: 416-260-4197
Address: G1-145 Front St E
Inner City Health Associates
Toronto ON M5A 1E3
Phone: 416-591-4411
Fax: 416-640-2072

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 31 Dec 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 31 Dec 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drucker and Kozloff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Nov 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Kozloff (CPSO#: 91600 ) Dr. A. Drucker (CPSO#: 90678 )
Business Address: 76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
(416) 323-7546
Business Address: CAMH
1025 Queen Street West
B1-4345
Toronto ON M6J 1H1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
1025 Queen Street West, B1-4345
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165358501
Extension: 30769
Fax: 416-260-4197
Address: G1-145 Front St E
Inner City Health Associates
Toronto ON M5A 1E3
Phone: 416-591-4411
Fax: 416-640-2072

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 31 Dec 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 31 Dec 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drucker and Kozloff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Nov 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Kozloff (CPSO#: 91600 ) Dr. A. Drucker (CPSO#: 90678 )
Business Address: 76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
(416) 323-7546
Business Address: CAMH
1025 Queen Street West
B1-4345
Toronto ON M6J 1H1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLE RACHEL KOZLOFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOZLOFF is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLE RACHEL KOZLOFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOZLOFF is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009