THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/04/25 00:34:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ruprecht Karl Univ of Heidelberg, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster University
Department of Paediatrics
Neonatology Room 4F
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 73490
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Effective: 22 Apr 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 22 Apr 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 22 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 22 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. el Helou Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Feb 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. el Helou (CPSO#: 92597 ) Dr. L. Neuendorff-el Helou (CPSO#: 99339 )
Business Address: McMaster University Children's Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
Neonatology Room 4F
1280 Main Street Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 73490

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN
Medical School: Ruprecht Karl Univ of Heidelberg, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster University
Department of Paediatrics
Neonatology Room 4F
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 73490
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Effective: 22 Apr 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 22 Apr 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 22 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 22 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. el Helou Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Feb 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. el Helou (CPSO#: 92597 ) Dr. L. Neuendorff-el Helou (CPSO#: 99339 )
Business Address: McMaster University Children's Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
Neonatology Room 4F
1280 Main Street Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 73490

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Jul 2014
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 01 2014
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Salhab el Helou may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Paediatrics, Division of Neonatology, McMaster University, in which
Dr. el Helou holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate
Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirement of his appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. el Helou
no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.


VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Salhab el Helou may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Paediatrics, Division of Neonatology, McMaster University, in which
Dr. el Helou holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate
Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirement of his appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. el Helou
no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ruprecht Karl Univ of Heidelberg, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Jul 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2010