THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 08:00:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ruprecht Karl Univ of Heidelberg, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Grenville St
Toronto ON M5S 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 323 6400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 11 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. el Helou Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Feb 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. el Helou (CPSO#: 92597 ) Dr. L. Neuendorff-el Helou (CPSO#: 99339 )
Business Address: McMaster University Children's Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
Neonatology Room 4F
1280 Main Street Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 73490

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN
Medical School: Ruprecht Karl Univ of Heidelberg, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Grenville St
Toronto ON M5S 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 323 6400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 11 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. el Helou Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Feb 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. el Helou (CPSO#: 92597 ) Dr. L. Neuendorff-el Helou (CPSO#: 99339 )
Business Address: McMaster University Children's Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
Neonatology Room 4F
1280 Main Street Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 73490

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUISE NEUENDORFF-EL HELOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEUENDORFF-EL HELOU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUISE NEUENDORFF-EL HELOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEUENDORFF-EL HELOU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ruprecht Karl Univ of Heidelberg, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Apr 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Nov 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Apr 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Nov 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Nov 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2012