THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:40:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: William Osler Health System
Emergency Department
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167473400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bhayana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Oct 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bhayana (CPSO#: 92888 ) Dr. A. Bhayana (CPSO#: 98189 )
Business Address: 302-2405 Lake Shore Blvd W
Etobicoke ON M8V 1C6
Business Address: Etobicoke General Hospital
Emergency Department
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 747-3400 Extn: 33530

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: William Osler Health System
Emergency Department
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167473400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bhayana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Oct 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bhayana (CPSO#: 92888 ) Dr. A. Bhayana (CPSO#: 98189 )
Business Address: 302-2405 Lake Shore Blvd W
Etobicoke ON M8V 1C6
Business Address: Etobicoke General Hospital
Emergency Department
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 747-3400 Extn: 33530

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DINESH BHAYANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHAYANA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DINESH BHAYANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHAYANA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Apr 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010