THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 15:36:31 PM

General Information

Former Name: Rastogi, Anjali (Used Until: 17 Nov 2015)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Rehab Institute
Bickle Centre
130 Dunn Ave
Toronto Ontario M6K 2R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 597-3422
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bhayana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Oct 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bhayana (CPSO#: 92888 ) Dr. A. Bhayana (CPSO#: 98189 )
Business Address: 302-2405 Lake Shore Blvd W
Etobicoke ON M8V 1C6
Business Address: Etobicoke General Hospital
Emergency Department
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 747-3400 Extn: 33530

General Information

Former Name: Rastogi, Anjali (Used Until: 17 Nov 2015)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Rehab Institute
Bickle Centre
130 Dunn Ave
Toronto Ontario M6K 2R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 597-3422
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bhayana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Oct 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bhayana (CPSO#: 92888 ) Dr. A. Bhayana (CPSO#: 98189 )
Business Address: 302-2405 Lake Shore Blvd W
Etobicoke ON M8V 1C6
Business Address: Etobicoke General Hospital
Emergency Department
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 747-3400 Extn: 33530

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANJALI BHAYANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHAYANA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANJALI BHAYANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHAYANA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Dec 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012