THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 15:51:23 PM

General Information

Former Name: Davis, Jennifer Lea (Used Until: 28 Jul 2010)
Medical School: Thomas Jefferson University, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kindercare Pediatrics
301-491 Eglinton Ave W
Toronto Ontario M5N 1A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 848-7665
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Developmental Pediatrics
Effective: 26 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Developmental Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Das Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Das (CPSO#: 93358 ) Dr. P. Das (CPSO#: 93381 )
Business Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke General Hospital
Toronto Ontario M9V 1R8
416-747-3400
Business Address: Health Centre at 80 Bond
80 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1X2
(416) 864-3011
Business Address: Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711
Business Address: 301-491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M5N 1A8
(416) 848-7665

General Information

Former Name: Davis, Jennifer Lea (Used Until: 28 Jul 2010)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Thomas Jefferson University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kindercare Pediatrics
301-491 Eglinton Ave W
Toronto Ontario M5N 1A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 848-7665
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Developmental Pediatrics
Effective: 26 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Developmental Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Das Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Das (CPSO#: 93358 ) Dr. P. Das (CPSO#: 93381 )
Business Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke General Hospital
Toronto Ontario M9V 1R8
416-747-3400
Business Address: Health Centre at 80 Bond
80 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1X2
(416) 864-3011
Business Address: Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711
Business Address: 301-491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M5N 1A8
(416) 848-7665

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER LEA DAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER LEA DAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Thomas Jefferson University, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010