THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:39:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Thomas Jefferson University, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Centre at 80 Bond
80 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-3011
Fax: (416) 864-3099
Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke General Hospital
Emergency Department
Toronto Ontario M9V 1R8
Phone: 416-747-3400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 15 Oct 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Das Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Das (CPSO#: 93358 ) Dr. P. Das (CPSO#: 93381 )
Business Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke General Hospital
Toronto Ontario M9V 1R8
416-747-3400
Business Address: Health Centre at 80 Bond
80 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1X2
(416) 864-3011
Business Address: Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711
Business Address: 301-491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M5N 1A8
(416) 848-7665

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI
Medical School: Thomas Jefferson University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Centre at 80 Bond
80 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-3011
Fax: (416) 864-3099
Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke General Hospital
Emergency Department
Toronto Ontario M9V 1R8
Phone: 416-747-3400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 15 Oct 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Das Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Das (CPSO#: 93358 ) Dr. P. Das (CPSO#: 93381 )
Business Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke General Hospital
Toronto Ontario M9V 1R8
416-747-3400
Business Address: Health Centre at 80 Bond
80 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1X2
(416) 864-3011
Business Address: Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711
Business Address: 301-491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M5N 1A8
(416) 848-7665

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL JOY DAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL JOY DAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Thomas Jefferson University, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010