THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 08:35:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Health Belleville
Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial Trenton
HOSPITAL: Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site
LOCATION: Picton

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial
LOCATION: Trenton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ryan Hall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Lafrance (CPSO#: 93461 ) Dr. R. Hall (CPSO#: 93765 )

Corporation Name: Kristy Lynn Lafrance Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Oct 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Health Belleville
Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial Trenton
HOSPITAL: Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site
LOCATION: Picton

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial
LOCATION: Trenton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ryan Hall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Lafrance (CPSO#: 93461 ) Dr. R. Hall (CPSO#: 93765 )

Corporation Name: Kristy Lynn Lafrance Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Oct 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTY LYNN LAFRANCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAFRANCE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTY LYNN LAFRANCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAFRANCE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Nov 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010