THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:19:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: P.0. Box 1000 Station Forces
Astra ON K0K 3W0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 392-2811
Extension: 3451
Fax: (613) 965-2639

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 16 Oct 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 16 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Nursing Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Nursing
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial Trenton
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

HOSPITAL: Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site
LOCATION: Picton

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial
LOCATION: Trenton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ryan Hall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Lafrance (CPSO#: 93461 ) Dr. R. Hall (CPSO#: 93765 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: P.0. Box 1000 Station Forces
Astra ON K0K 3W0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 392-2811
Extension: 3451
Fax: (613) 965-2639

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 16 Oct 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 16 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Nursing Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Nursing
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial Trenton
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

HOSPITAL: Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site
LOCATION: Picton

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial
LOCATION: Trenton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ryan Hall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Lafrance (CPSO#: 93461 ) Dr. R. Hall (CPSO#: 93765 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RYAN WILLIAM HALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RYAN WILLIAM HALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Nov 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010