THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:44:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. Matthew's University, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1083 Ouellette Ave
3rd Floor
Windsor Ontario N9A 4J8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 915-7125
Fax: (519) 962-3339

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeffrey Nigl Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Oct 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Nigl (CPSO#: 107868 ) Dr. C. Blue (CPSO#: 94354 )
Business Address: 2464 Howard Ave
Windsor ON N8X 3V6
2267827246
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 973-4411

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Farago III Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jun 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Farago III (CPSO#: 96622 ) Dr. C. Blue (CPSO#: 94354 )
Business Address: 3019 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor Ontario N8W 1G8
(519) 258-4773
Business Address: 380 Pelissier Street
Windsor Ontario N9A 6W8
(519) 962-0749
Business Address: 6525 Malden Road
Windsor Ontario N9H 1T5
(519) 258-4773
Business Address: 433 Sandwich South
Amherstburg Ontario N9V 3K8
(519) 258-4773
Business Address: 1883 Turner Rd
Windsor ON N8W 3K2

Corporation Name: Christopher Blue Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Blue (CPSO#: 94354 )
Business Address: 1083 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 4J8
(519) 915-7125

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. Matthew's University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1083 Ouellette Ave
3rd Floor
Windsor Ontario N9A 4J8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 915-7125
Fax: (519) 962-3339

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeffrey Nigl Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Oct 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Nigl (CPSO#: 107868 ) Dr. C. Blue (CPSO#: 94354 )
Business Address: 2464 Howard Ave
Windsor ON N8X 3V6
2267827246
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 973-4411

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Farago III Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jun 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Farago III (CPSO#: 96622 ) Dr. C. Blue (CPSO#: 94354 )
Business Address: 3019 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor Ontario N8W 1G8
(519) 258-4773
Business Address: 380 Pelissier Street
Windsor Ontario N9A 6W8
(519) 962-0749
Business Address: 6525 Malden Road
Windsor Ontario N9H 1T5
(519) 258-4773
Business Address: 433 Sandwich South
Amherstburg Ontario N9V 3K8
(519) 258-4773
Business Address: 1883 Turner Rd
Windsor ON N8W 3K2

Corporation Name: Christopher Blue Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Blue (CPSO#: 94354 )
Business Address: 1083 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 4J8
(519) 915-7125

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER KEITH BLUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLUE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER KEITH BLUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLUE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 09 Jan 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 
 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 09 Jan 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 
 

Training

Medical School: St. Matthew's University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Apr 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Apr 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 09 Nov 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Apr 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Apr 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Mar 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Mar 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Mar 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Apr 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Apr 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Apr 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 09 Nov 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2010