THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:08:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1883 Turner Road
Windsor Ontario N8W 3K2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2269461000
Fax: 5192534713
Address: 433 Sandwich Street South
Amherstburg Ontario N9V 3K8
Phone: 2269461000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 433 Sandwich St S
Amherstburg ON N9V 3K8
Phone: 2269461000
Extension: 2
Fax: No Information Available
Address: C-930 Old Tecumseh Rd
Belle River ON N0R 1A0
Phone: 2269461000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 186 Talbot St S
Essex ON N8M 1B6
Phone: 2269461000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 103-200 Main St E
Kingsville ON N9Y 1A6
Phone: 2269461000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 15 Linda St
Tilbury ON N0P 2L0
Phone: 2269461000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1083 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 4J8
Phone: 2269461000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 6525 Malden Road
Windsor Ontario N9H 1T5
Phone: 2269461000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2335 Dougall Ave
Windsor ON N8X 1S9
Phone: 2269461000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Farago III Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jun 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Farago III (CPSO#: 96622 ) Dr. C. Blue (CPSO#: 94354 )
Business Address: 3019 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor Ontario N8W 1G8
(519) 258-4773
Business Address: 380 Pelissier Street
Windsor Ontario N9A 6W8
(519) 962-0749
Business Address: 6525 Malden Road
Windsor Ontario N9H 1T5
(519) 258-4773
Business Address: 433 Sandwich South
Amherstburg Ontario N9V 3K8
(519) 258-4773
Business Address: 1883 Turner Rd
Windsor ON N8W 3K2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1883 Turner Road
Windsor Ontario N8W 3K2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2269461000
Fax: 5192534713
Address: 433 Sandwich Street South
Amherstburg Ontario N9V 3K8
Phone: 2269461000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 433 Sandwich St S
Amherstburg ON N9V 3K8
Phone: 2269461000
Extension: 2
Fax: No Information Available
Address: C-930 Old Tecumseh Rd
Belle River ON N0R 1A0
Phone: 2269461000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 186 Talbot St S
Essex ON N8M 1B6
Phone: 2269461000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 103-200 Main St E
Kingsville ON N9Y 1A6
Phone: 2269461000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 15 Linda St
Tilbury ON N0P 2L0
Phone: 2269461000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1083 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 4J8
Phone: 2269461000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 6525 Malden Road
Windsor Ontario N9H 1T5
Phone: 2269461000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2335 Dougall Ave
Windsor ON N8X 1S9
Phone: 2269461000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Farago III Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jun 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Farago III (CPSO#: 96622 ) Dr. C. Blue (CPSO#: 94354 )
Business Address: 3019 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor Ontario N8W 1G8
(519) 258-4773
Business Address: 380 Pelissier Street
Windsor Ontario N9A 6W8
(519) 962-0749
Business Address: 6525 Malden Road
Windsor Ontario N9H 1T5
(519) 258-4773
Business Address: 433 Sandwich South
Amherstburg Ontario N9V 3K8
(519) 258-4773
Business Address: 1883 Turner Rd
Windsor ON N8W 3K2

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
20 Dec 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 20 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1 of 2)
As from 12:01 a.m., December 20, 2024, by order of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Peter Joseph Farago II:

Practice Restrictions
1) Dr. Farago must only prescribe to patients with whom he has established a physician-patient relationship and with whom he has conducted a patient encounter, whether in-person or virtual.
2) Dr. Farago must comply with the College’s Prescribing Drugs, Medical Records Documentation, and Medical Records Management Policies.
3) Dr. Farago must only prescribe medications that are within the scope of practice of family medicine and addiction medicine.
4) When practising under the authority of his certificate of registration with the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, Dr. Farago must only prescribe to patients who are residents of Ontario.

Prescribing Log
5) Dr. Farago shall keep a Log of all prescriptions in the form attached as set out in Schedule “A”, which will include at least the following information (the “Prescribing Log”):
(a) The date of the appointment;
(b) The name of the patient and chart/file number;
(c) The name of the medication prescribed, drug strength and quantity, directions for use, and frequency;
(d) The clinical indication; and
(e) Dr. Farago’s signature.

Monitoring
6) Dr. Farago shall, within three (3) days of the date of this Order, inform the College of each and every location at which he practises, delegates controlled acts, or has privileges, including but not limited to any hospitals, offices, and any Out-of-Hospital Premises or Independent Health Facilities with which he is affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively, his “Practice Location” or “Practice Locations”). Going forward, he shall inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations. within three (3) days of beginning practice at that location.
7) The College may share this Order with the Chief of Staff, Medical Director, or an equivalent individual at any of Dr. Farago’s Practice Locations, and may share any information underlying this Order with such an individual if deemed necessary for the purpose of monitoring and facilitating Dr. Farago’s compliance with the Order.
8) Dr. Farago shall consent to the disclosure to the College, by staff, Chiefs of Staff, Medical Directors, or physicians at any of Dr. Farago’s Practice Locations, of all information necessary to monitor and facilitate Dr. Farago’s compliance with the Order.
9) Dr. Farago shall cooperate fully with College representatives for the purpose of monitoring his compliance with the Order, including but not limited to providing any requested documentation within specified timelines.
10) Dr. Farago shall within three (3) days of this Order provide the College with his irrevocable consent in the forms attached at Schedules “B” and “C” to make appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan and the
Narcotic Monitoring System, to monitor his compliance with this Order.
11) Dr. Farago shall provide additional signed consent forms, should the College determine in its sole discretion that these are required to monitor Dr. Farago’s compliance with this Order.
12) Dr. Farago shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of his Practice Locations by College representatives for the purpose of monitoring compliance with this Order.
Dr. Farago shall be responsible for the payment of any fees, costs, charges, or expenses arising from implementation of this Order.

(2 of 2)
Dr. Peter Joseph Farago III may practise independently in addiction medicine and family medicine, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1 of 2)
As from 12:01 a.m., December 20, 2024, by order of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Peter Joseph Farago II:

Practice Restrictions
1) Dr. Farago must only prescribe to patients with whom he has established a physician-patient relationship and with whom he has conducted a patient encounter, whether in-person or virtual.
2) Dr. Farago must comply with the College’s Prescribing Drugs, Medical Records Documentation, and Medical Records Management Policies.
3) Dr. Farago must only prescribe medications that are within the scope of practice of family medicine and addiction medicine.
4) When practising under the authority of his certificate of registration with the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, Dr. Farago must only prescribe to patients who are residents of Ontario.

Prescribing Log
5) Dr. Farago shall keep a Log of all prescriptions in the form attached as set out in Schedule “A”, which will include at least the following information (the “Prescribing Log”):
(a) The date of the appointment;
(b) The name of the patient and chart/file number;
(c) The name of the medication prescribed, drug strength and quantity, directions for use, and frequency;
(d) The clinical indication; and
(e) Dr. Farago’s signature.

Monitoring
6) Dr. Farago shall, within three (3) days of the date of this Order, inform the College of each and every location at which he practises, delegates controlled acts, or has privileges, including but not limited to any hospitals, offices, and any Out-of-Hospital Premises or Independent Health Facilities with which he is affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively, his “Practice Location” or “Practice Locations”). Going forward, he shall inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations. within three (3) days of beginning practice at that location.
7) The College may share this Order with the Chief of Staff, Medical Director, or an equivalent individual at any of Dr. Farago’s Practice Locations, and may share any information underlying this Order with such an individual if deemed necessary for the purpose of monitoring and facilitating Dr. Farago’s compliance with the Order.
8) Dr. Farago shall consent to the disclosure to the College, by staff, Chiefs of Staff, Medical Directors, or physicians at any of Dr. Farago’s Practice Locations, of all information necessary to monitor and facilitate Dr. Farago’s compliance with the Order.
9) Dr. Farago shall cooperate fully with College representatives for the purpose of monitoring his compliance with the Order, including but not limited to providing any requested documentation within specified timelines.
10) Dr. Farago shall within three (3) days of this Order provide the College with his irrevocable consent in the forms attached at Schedules “B” and “C” to make appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan and the
Narcotic Monitoring System, to monitor his compliance with this Order.
11) Dr. Farago shall provide additional signed consent forms, should the College determine in its sole discretion that these are required to monitor Dr. Farago’s compliance with this Order.
12) Dr. Farago shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of his Practice Locations by College representatives for the purpose of monitoring compliance with this Order.
Dr. Farago shall be responsible for the payment of any fees, costs, charges, or expenses arising from implementation of this Order.

(2 of 2)
Dr. Peter Joseph Farago III may practise independently in addiction medicine and family medicine, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee. Effective: 20 Dec 2024
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Oct 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 06 Nov 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 06 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 May 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 May 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Dec 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2024

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Oct 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 06 Nov 2013

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 06 Nov 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 May 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 May 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 May 2012

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 2011