THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 05:03:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 181 Bay St
Toronto ON M5J 2T3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 507-6600
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Cleveland Clinic Canada
181 Bay St, 30th floor
Toronto Ontario M5J 2T3
Phone: 416-507-6600
Fax: No Information Available
Address: L122-2075 Bayview Ave
M1-700
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-480-4908
Fax: 416-480-6897

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Champagne And Dr. Chuang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Feb 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chuang (CPSO#: 95273 ) Dr. T. Champagne (CPSO#: 95271 )
Business Address: University of Toronto
Postgraduate Medical Hospital
Suite 602
500 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1V7
Business Address: Women's College Hospital
RKS Dermatology, 5th Floor
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2

Corporation Name: Dr. Trevor Champagne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Feb 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 181 Bay St
Toronto ON M5J 2T3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 507-6600
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Cleveland Clinic Canada
181 Bay St, 30th floor
Toronto Ontario M5J 2T3
Phone: 416-507-6600
Fax: No Information Available
Address: L122-2075 Bayview Ave
M1-700
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-480-4908
Fax: 416-480-6897

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Champagne And Dr. Chuang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Feb 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chuang (CPSO#: 95273 ) Dr. T. Champagne (CPSO#: 95271 )
Business Address: University of Toronto
Postgraduate Medical Hospital
Suite 602
500 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1V7
Business Address: Women's College Hospital
RKS Dermatology, 5th Floor
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2

Corporation Name: Dr. Trevor Champagne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Feb 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TREVOR CHAMPAGNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAMPAGNE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TREVOR CHAMPAGNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAMPAGNE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011