THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 08:18:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 204-595 Columbia St W
Unit 204
Kamloops BC V2C 1K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 236-218-2330
Fax: 250-434-1328

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 09 Feb 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 09 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Champagne And Dr. Chuang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Feb 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chuang (CPSO#: 95273 ) Dr. T. Champagne (CPSO#: 95271 )
Business Address: University of Toronto
Postgraduate Medical Hospital
Suite 602
500 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1V7
Business Address: Women's College Hospital
RKS Dermatology, 5th Floor
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 204-595 Columbia St W
Unit 204
Kamloops BC V2C 1K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 236-218-2330
Fax: 250-434-1328

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 09 Feb 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 09 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Champagne And Dr. Chuang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Feb 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chuang (CPSO#: 95273 ) Dr. T. Champagne (CPSO#: 95271 )
Business Address: University of Toronto
Postgraduate Medical Hospital
Suite 602
500 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1V7
Business Address: Women's College Hospital
RKS Dermatology, 5th Floor
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RITA JO-YUN CHUANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RITA JO-YUN CHUANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011