THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:10:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Evans & Dr. Caudarella Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Evans (CPSO#: 95580 ) Dr. A. Caudarella (CPSO#: 97953 )
Business Address: 301 - 491 Eglinton Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5N 1A5
(416) 860-6696
Business Address: 555 University
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-7500
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
17th Floor, Cardinal Carter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 360-4000
Business Address: 825 Coxwell Avenue
East York Ontario M4C 3E7
Business Address: 401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Evans & Dr. Caudarella Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Evans (CPSO#: 95580 ) Dr. A. Caudarella (CPSO#: 97953 )
Business Address: 301 - 491 Eglinton Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5N 1A5
(416) 860-6696
Business Address: 555 University
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-7500
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
17th Floor, Cardinal Carter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 360-4000
Business Address: 825 Coxwell Avenue
East York Ontario M4C 3E7
Business Address: 401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREA BLAIR EVANS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EVANS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREA BLAIR EVANS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EVANS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011