THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 17:26:03 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 75 Albert Street
Suite 500
Ottawa Ontario K1P 5E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 778-872-3486
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Casey House Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Casey House
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Evans & Dr. Caudarella Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Evans (CPSO#: 95580 ) Dr. A. Caudarella (CPSO#: 97953 )
Business Address: 301 - 491 Eglinton Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5N 1A5
(416) 860-6696
Business Address: 555 University
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-7500
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
17th Floor, Cardinal Carter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 360-4000
Business Address: 825 Coxwell Avenue
East York Ontario M4C 3E7
Business Address: 401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 75 Albert Street
Suite 500
Ottawa Ontario K1P 5E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 778-872-3486
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Casey House Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Casey House
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Evans & Dr. Caudarella Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Evans (CPSO#: 95580 ) Dr. A. Caudarella (CPSO#: 97953 )
Business Address: 301 - 491 Eglinton Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5N 1A5
(416) 860-6696
Business Address: 555 University
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-7500
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
17th Floor, Cardinal Carter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 360-4000
Business Address: 825 Coxwell Avenue
East York Ontario M4C 3E7
Business Address: 401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDER CAUDARELLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAUDARELLA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDER CAUDARELLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAUDARELLA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Nov 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012