THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 08:35:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Perth and Smith Falls
District Hospital
33 Drummond Street West
Perth Ontario K7H 2K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 267-1500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

HOSPITAL: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Carleton Place

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gutcher Last Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Last (CPSO#: 97938 ) Dr. S. Gutcher (CPSO#: 95823 )
Business Address: 39 Drummond Street West
Perth Ontario K7H 2J9
(613) 264-2686
Business Address: Perth and Smith Falls
District Hospital
33 Drummond Street West
Perth Ontario K7H 2K1
(613) 267-1500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Perth and Smith Falls
District Hospital
33 Drummond Street West
Perth Ontario K7H 2K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 267-1500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

HOSPITAL: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Carleton Place

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gutcher Last Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Last (CPSO#: 97938 ) Dr. S. Gutcher (CPSO#: 95823 )
Business Address: 39 Drummond Street West
Perth Ontario K7H 2J9
(613) 264-2686
Business Address: Perth and Smith Falls
District Hospital
33 Drummond Street West
Perth Ontario K7H 2K1
(613) 267-1500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SPENCER THOMAS GUTCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUTCHER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SPENCER THOMAS GUTCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUTCHER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011